Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Richard Vandepels, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Don Mathews, against Frank Cortez, represented by Linda Smith, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryCa Damages Monetary |
Last RefreshedSeptember 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Final Judgment
Date: December 13, 2010Stipulation for Dismissal
Date: August 31, 2010Order of Dismissal (Counter Petition)
Date: August 31, 2010Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Images Purged | |
January 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Returned Mail | |
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Order Adopting Report & Recommendations | |
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Report & Recommendation of General Magistrate | |
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Minutes | |
November 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing 12-28-11 at 10:30am | |
November 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Cancellation of Hearing 11-15-11 at 2:30pm | |
October 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Order of Referral to General Magistrate | |
October 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Nov. 15 at 2:30 | |
October 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Objection to Claim of Exemption |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.