Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Bank Of America Na, Ileana Rodriguez, Jose Hernandez, Tenant 1, Tenant 2, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryCa Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Order Rescheduling Foreclosure Sale
Date: July 09, 2009Motion for Order
Date: July 01, 2008Complaint
Date: December 28, 2007Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: July 01, 2008Motion to Reschedule Foreclosure Sale
Date: July 09, 2009Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Suggestion of Bankruptcy | |
August 21, 2009 | Hearing | ||
August 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title (Recorded) | |
August 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements Issued | |
August 10, 2009 | Hearing | ||
August 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
August 10, 2009 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale Issued | |
July 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication - Notice of Sale | |
July 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Order Rescheduling Foreclosure Sale | |
July 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion to Reschedule Foreclosure Sale |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.