Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Indymac Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Milagros Martinez, Omar Trujillo, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryCa Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a civil action filed by IndyMac Bank F.S.B. against Omar Trujillo, Milagros Perez Martinez, and any unknown parties claiming an interest in the property. The complaint is for mortgage foreclosure. IndyMac Bank alleges that a promiss...
Complaint
Date: December 28, 2007Motion to Dismissetc..
Date: February 09, 2009Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: March 25, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2009 | Docket Event | No Original Documents Filed | |
February 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Order Setting Aside Judgment | |
February 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismissetc.. | |
February 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
October 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing11-7-08 @ 8:30am | |
October 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Amounts Due and Owing | |
October 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing | |
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Minutes | |
June 03, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing6-17-08 @ 3:30pm | |
May 26, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Amounts Due and Owing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.