Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Eagle Creek Corp, filed a(n) Ca Declaratory Judgment case represented by Darrin Schutt, Frederick Kramer, against Iranna Casimir, Raynald Casimir, represented by Darrin Schutt, Frederick Kramer, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts with John S. Carlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn S. Carlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2007 |
CategoryCa Declaratory Judgment |
Last RefreshedSeptember 18, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
|
Order of Dismissal
Date: October 17, 2011Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2020 | Docket Event | Images Purged | |
October 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Mediation Department Billing Statement | |
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Stipulation for Dismissal | |
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Mediation Record of Agreement w/Order | |
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Mediator Report | |
October 04, 2011 | Docket Event | Pretrial Conference Order | |
October 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Minutes | |
September 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Order Continuing Trial | |
September 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Joint Stipulation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.