Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Tierone Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Andrea Rolf, R Fry Builders Inc, in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryCa Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is filed by TierOne Bank against defendants Andrea Lynn Rolf, R. Fry Builders, Inc., and unknown tenants/owners. TierOne Bank is the holder of the note and mortgage related to the property in question. Andrea Lynn Rolf is the record ow...
Motion for Extension of Time
Date: April 08, 2008Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counter Claim
Date: March 17, 2008Complaint
Date: December 28, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion for Default and Default (Issued) | |
May 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Dropping Party | |
May 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
May 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Voluntary Dismissal | |
April 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion for Extension of Time | |
March 20, 2008 | Docket Event | R Fry Builders Inc - Summons (20 day) Issued | |
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counter Claim | |
March 17, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
February 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Lost Summons | |
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event | R Fry Builders Inc - Summons (20 day) Issued |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.