Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Indymac Bank Fsb, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Antoine Jeannot, Jane Doe, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Nadine Jeannot, Unknown Parties, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Lee County, FL, . Lee County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryCa Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationLee County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Circuit Court of the 20th Judicial Circuit in Lee County, Florida. The plaintiff, IndyMac Bank, is seeking to foreclose a mortgage on real property owned by Nadine E. Jeannot and Antoine Jeannot. The mo...
Motion for Summary Judgment
Date: April 01, 2008Complaint
Date: December 28, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 29, 2008 | Hearing | ||
July 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disbursements Issued | |
July 29, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Title Issued | |
July 18, 2008 | Hearing | ||
July 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Sale Issuedwent back to pltf for $100.00 | |
July 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Bid Sheet | |
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication - Notice of Sale | |
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing Original Documents | |
June 13, 2008 | Docket Event | Final Judgment (Summary) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.