Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by White, in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with CURINGTON, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCURINGTON, EMILY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
CONTRACT FOR PARTIAL PAYMENTS SIGNED; OWES $25.00 SERVICE CHARGE
Date: October 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: August 30, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | PETITION AND ORDER FOR TERMINATION OF PROBATION | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
PAID $95.22 ON RECEIPT 2718770, BALANCE DUE: $358.50 $95.22 2718770 Balance Due: $358.50 |
|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
PAID $113.85 ON RECEIPT 2718768, BALANCE DUE: $450.50 $113.85 2718768 Balance Due: $450.50 |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
PAID $113.85 ON RECEIPT 2704791, BALANCE DUE: $652.50 $113.85 2704791 Balance Due: $652.50 |
|
January 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
PAID $95.22 ON RECEIPT 2704792, BALANCE DUE: $560.50 $95.22 2704792 Balance Due: $560.50 |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
MODIFIED PAYMENT PLAN SCHEDULE Payment Plan Modified |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
CONTRACT FOR PARTIAL PAYMENTS SIGNED; OWES $25.00 SERVICE CHARGE $542.50 12 PAYMENTS @ $46.00 PER MONTH PAY LIST GIVEN |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $134.55 ON RECEIPT 2688119, BALANCE DUE: $762.50 PB $134.55 2688119 Balance Due: $762.50 |
|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAYMENT PLAN SCHEDULE PAYMENT PLAN CREATED FOR: $46.00-MONTHLY BEGINNING 11/29/2021 |
|
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER WITHHOLDING ADJUDICATION OF GUILT AND PLACING DEFT ON PROBATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.