Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by White, in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with CURINGTON, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCURINGTON, EMILY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 23, 2021 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
BOND DISCHARGED
Date: April 20, 2022DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT
Date: November 15, 2021CONTRACT FOR PARTIAL PAYMENTS SIGNED; OWES $25.00 SERVICE CHARGE
Date: April 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
PAID $50.00 ON RECEIPT 2742256, BALANCE DUE: $645.00 $50.00 2742256 Balance Due: $645.00 |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT ASSESSING FEES, SERVICE CHARGES, COSTS AND FINES | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | BOND DISCHARGED | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | CONTRACT FOR PARTIAL PAYMENTS SIGNED; OWES $25.00 SERVICE CHARGE | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
PAYMENT PLAN SCHEDULE PAYMENT PLAN CREATED FOR: $25.00-MONTHLY BEGINNING 5/20/2022 |
|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
PAID $200.00 ON RECEIPT 2731588, BALANCE DUE: $670.00 $200.00 2731588 Balance Due: $670.00 |
|
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | 5 DAYS TO PAY DUE BY 4/25/2022 | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | $200.00 PUBLIC DEFENDER FEE | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | $238.00 COURT COSTS | |
April 20, 2022 | Docket Event | $100.00 PUBLIC DEFENDER APPLICATION FEE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.