Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
State Attorney, filed a(n) Mental Health case against Burch, Glenn, in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with Metz, Larry presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMetz, Larry Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryMental Health |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGE REASSIGNMENT PER ADMIN ORDER L-2022-36-B DATED JULY 17, 2023 METZ, LARRY SENIOR COVERAGE JUDGE 8, Per Admin Order L-2022-36-B dated July 17, 2023 |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Cancelled JR - MENTAL HEALTH JURY TRIAL on 6/5/2023 8:30:00 AM due to | |
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
SET ON MHJR - JIMMY RYCE HEARING DOCKET 6/20/2023 BEGINNING AT 9:00 AM MHJR - JIMMY RYCE HEARING 6/20/2023 9:00 AM |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Cancelled JR - MENTAL HEALTH JURY TRIAL on 6/6/2023 8:30:00 AM due to | |
May 31, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR CONTINUANCE | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT NOTES FROM | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
DISCOVERY SUPPLEMENTAL DISCOVERY EXHIBIT #2 |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING CASE FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CIVIL JURY TRIAL |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
SET ON MHJR - JIMMY RYCE HEARING DOCKET 5/25/2023 BEGINNING AT 8:30 AM MHJR - JIMMY RYCE HEARING 5/25/2023 8:30 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.