Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with EMLING, JONI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEMLING, JONI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
CHILD SUPPORT WORKING COPY OF FINAL ORDER CREDITING PAYMENTS |
|
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST | |
March 21, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | DEMOGRAPHIC INFORMATION SHEET | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER OF THE PARTIES | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | CLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | INCOME DEDUCTION ORDER | |
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER FILED AND RECORDED | |
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
CHILD SUPPORT WORKING COPY OF FINAL ORDER VACATING ADMINISTRATIVE SUPPORT ORDER |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK OF COURT ACTION REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.