Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with WELKE, BRIAN J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWELKE, BRIAN J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
February 01, 2022 | Docket Event | COPY OF VITAL STATISTICS FORM | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR 2/1/22 @ 9 AM VIA ZOOM |
|
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
COPY OF LICENSE OF BRANTLEY, KAREN ELIZABETH BRANTLEY, KAREN ELIZABETH |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE / AFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS ON BEHALF OF BRANTLEY, RICHARD TREY BRANTLEY, RICHARD TREY |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF BRANTLEY, KAREN ELIZABETH BRANTLEY, KAREN ELIZABETH |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER BRANTLEY, KAREN ELIZABETH BRANTLEY, KAREN ELIZABETH |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER BRANTLEY, RICHARD TREY BRANTLEY, RICHARD TREY |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF BRANTLEY, RICHARD TREY BRANTLEY, RICHARD TREY |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.