Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with TAKAC, MICHAEL G presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTAKAC, MICHAEL G Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissed, Settled or Disposed After Hearing | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF ZOOM HEARING // OCTOBER 19, 2021 AT 8:30 A.M. |
|
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
COPY OF LICENSE OF RACKOFF, JENNIFER,FIGUEROA, GRACE CRUZ RACKOFF, JENNIFER,FIGUEROA, GRACE CRUZ |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $408.00 ON RECEIPT 2674742, FULLY PAID $408.00 2674742 Fully Paid |
|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER RACKOFF, JENNIFER RACKOFF, JENNIFER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.