Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with MOSLEY, DAN R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOSLEY, DAN R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND ORDER ADOPTING AND INCORPORATING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF VITAL STATISTICS FORM | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Disposed by Judge | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
November 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE AND NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR 12/14/2021 AT 8:30AM |
|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Disposed by Judge | |
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $408.00 ON RECEIPT 2685248, FULLY PAID $408.00 2685248 Fully Paid |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
COPY OF LICENSE OF HODGE, LENZY JR HODGE, LENZY JR |
|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.