Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Thomas, Brenda, in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with WELKE, BRIAN J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWELKE, BRIAN J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Dismissed, Settled or Disposed After Hearing | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF PETITION | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ATTY. FOR RESPONDENT: HOBBY, MICHELE | |
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING CAUSE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 7/12/22 @ 11:30 AM VIA ZOOM |
|
May 25, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROCEDURAL CHANGES TO FLORIDA FAMILY LAW RULES OF PROCEDURE 12.490 | |
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER CANCELLING HEARING |
|
March 03, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGE REASSIGNMENT PER ADMIN ORDER L-2021-22-C DATED FEBRUARY 23RD, 2022 MOSLEY, DAN R WELKE, BRIAN J Per Admin Order L-2021-22-C dated February 23rd, 2022 |
|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CAUSE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CAUSE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.