Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with MOSLEY, DAN R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOSLEY, DAN R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Disposed by Judge | |
April 28, 2022 | Docket Event | RECOMMENDED ORDER OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE AFTER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
PARENTING PLAN SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES |
|
April 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROCEDURAL CHANGES TO FLORIDA FAMILY LAW RULES OF PROCEDURE 12.490 | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE CASE MANAGEMENT CONF SET 4/28/22 @ 1 :30 PM VIA ZOOM |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE BY LAPLANTE, VANESSA MARIE LAPLANTE, VANESSA MARIE |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF LAPLANTE, VANESSA MARIE LAPLANTE, VANESSA MARIE |
|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
PARENTING PLAN SIGNED BY RESPONDENT ONLY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.