Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with MOSLEY, DAN R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOSLEY, DAN R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 27, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT/CERTIFICATE OF DELINQUENCY FILED AND RECORDED | |
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DELINQUENCY IN CHILD SUPPORT PAYMENTS | |
August 09, 2021 | Docket Event | CHILD SUPPORT WORKING COPY OF | |
August 05, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF VITAL STATISTICS FORM | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Disposed by Judge | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | INCOME WITHHOLDING FOR SUPPORT | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND ORDER ADOPTING AND INCORPORATING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE AMENDED |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE AND NOTICE OF HEARING // AUGUST 2, 2021 AT 9:00 A.M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.