Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Diaz Centeno, Jeremy, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lewis, Naomi Janel, in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with MOSLEY, DAN R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOSLEY, DAN R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGE REASSIGNMENT PER ADMIN ORDER L-2021-22-C DATED FEBRUARY 23RD, 2022 MOSLEY, DAN R WELKE, BRIAN J Per Admin Order L-2021-22-C dated February 23rd, 2022 |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER RATIFYING TEMPORARY MEDIATION AGREEMENT |
|
February 09, 2022 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER DATED | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event | MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT | |
December 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT TEMPORARY |
|
December 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $120.00 ON RECEIPT 2698161, FULLY PAID $120.00 2698161 Fully Paid |
|
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $120.00 ON RECEIPT 2693387, BALANCE DUE: $120.00 $120.00 2693387 Balance Due: $120.00 |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER DATED | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION SET FOR 12/13/21 AT 1:30PM |
|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION AND ORDER APPOINTING COURT MEDIATION SERVICES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.