Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with WELKE, BRIAN J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWELKE, BRIAN J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2022 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
PAID $11.39 ON RECEIPT 2722102, FULLY PAID $11.39 2722102 Fully Paid |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF VITAL STATISTICS FORM | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Disposed by Judge | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED AND RECORDED | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR 9.14.2021 AT 9:00AM |
|
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT | |
July 27, 2021 | Docket Event | MEDIATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT | |
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $62.10 ON RECEIPT 2663510, FULLY PAID $62.10 2663510 Fully Paid |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $62.10 ON RECEIPT 2663048, BALANCE DUE: $60.00 $62.10 2663048 Balance Due: $60.00 |
|
July 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION, APPOINTING MEDIATOR, AND ASSESSING MEDIATION FEE 7/27/21 @ 9:30 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.