Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with MOSLEY, DAN R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMOSLEY, DAN R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 07, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $10.00 ON RECEIPT 2679047, FULLY PAID $10.00 2679047 Fully Paid |
|
July 21, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF VITAL STATISTICS FORM | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Disposed by Judge | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE AFTER FINAL HEARING ON PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILDREN |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND ORDER ADOPTING AND INCORPORATING THE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF THE GENERAL MAGISTRATE | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE HEARING SET 7/12/21 @ 9 AM VIA ZOOM |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | VITAL STATISTIC FORM NOT SIGNED (FOR FUTURE USE) | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WAIVER AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED BY ANGELES, JASMINE ALYSSA ANGELES, JASMINE ALYSSA |
|
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE BY AND WAIVER//RESPONDENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.