Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with WELKE, BRIAN J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWELKE, BRIAN J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $6.00 ON RECEIPT 2629290, FULLY PAID $6.00 2629290 Fully Paid |
|
March 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE TO ROMEO XAVIER SIMPSON |
|
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF VITAL STATISTICS FORM | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Disposed by Judge | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED AND RECORDED | |
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR MARCH 9, 2021 AT 9AM VIA ZOOM |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WAIVER AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED BY SIMPSON, ROMEO XAVIER SIMPSON, ROMEO XAVIER |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF SIMPSON, ROMEO XAVIER SIMPSON, ROMEO XAVIER |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FILED BYSIMPSON, JENNIFER STACIE SIMPSON, JENNIFER STACIE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.