Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with WELKE, BRIAN J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWELKE, BRIAN J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF VITAL STATISTICS FORM | |
May 11, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
April 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR MAY 11, 2021 AT 9 AM VIA ZOOM |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER BADARNI, MEGAN BADARNI, MEGAN |
|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF BADARNI, MEGAN BADARNI, MEGAN |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER BROWN, VACARIA BROWN, VACARIA |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT OF BROWN, VACARIA BROWN, VACARIA |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
COPY OF LICENSE OF BROWN, VACARIA BROWN, VACARIA |
|
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $3.62 ON RECEIPT 2623083, FULLY PAID $3.62 2623083 Fully Paid |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.