Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Aei Income And Growth Fund 25 Llc, Aei Income And Growth Fund Xxii Limited Partnership, filed a(n) Circuit Civil case against Barclay, Ricardo A, Music House Llc, in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with METZ, LARRY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMETZ, LARRY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2020 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
|
This complaint is filed by AEI Income & Growth Fund XXII Limited Partnership and AEI Income & Growth Fund 25 LLC (collectively referred to as "AEI") against The Music House, LLC and Ricardo A. Barclay (collectively referred to as "Music House") for e...
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR
Date: January 30, 2023ORDER
Date: November 22, 2022MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: January 12, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF COUNTER-DEFENDANT |
|
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF ALL PENDING COUNTERCLAIMS // GRANTED |
|
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR MARCH 3, 2023 AT 9:45 AM // REGARDING COUNTER-DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTER-PLAINTIFF'S COUNTER CLAIMS |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS COUNTER CLAIMS |
|
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME // GRANTED |
|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANTS/COUNTER-PLAINTIFFS |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR DEFENDANTS/COUNTER-PLAINTIFFS | |
September 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR NOVEMBER 15, 2022 @ 2:00 PM VIA ZOOM AS TO DEFT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME |
|
August 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.