Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with CURINGTON, EMILY presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCURINGTON, EMILY Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2020 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMay 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
BOND DISCHARGED
Date: January 13, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF INDIGENT STATUS - QUALIFIES FOR PUBLIC DEFENDER
Date: December 21, 2020ORDER ON FIRST APPEARANCE REGARDING COUNSEL - APPOINTED
Date: December 21, 2020VICTIM NOTIFICATION/IDENTIFICATION INFORMATION
Date: December 21, 2020INVESTIGATIVE COST REPORT
Date: December 21, 2020NO VICTIM CONTACT ORDER
Date: December 21, 2020ARREST AFFIDAVIT
Date: December 21, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | MAIL RETURNED | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Cancelled PNC - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE on 1/25/2021 1:30:00 PM due to CASE DISPOSED | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASES FOR PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Cancelled SNT - TRAFFIC/MISDEMEANOR SENTENCING on 2/8/2021 1:30:00 PM due to CASE DISPOSED | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | BOND DISCHARGED | |
January 13, 2021 | Docket Event | ANNOUNCEMENT OF NO INFORMATION | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER RELIEVING PUBLIC DEFENDER (SUBSTITUTION) | |
January 07, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO WITHDRAW & SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL FILED BY PUBLIC DEFENDER | |
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
SET ON PNC - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE DOCKET 1/25/2021 BEGINNING AT 1:30 PM PNC - PLEA NEGOTIATION CONFERENCE 1/25/2021 1:30 PM |
|
January 06, 2021 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR FAVORABLE AND IMPEACHMENT INFORMATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.