Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by White, in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with PEPPERMAN, CARLA R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePEPPERMAN, CARLA R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 22, 2020 |
CategoryNon Criminal Infraction |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
TOBACCO LETTER MAILED TO DEFENDANT'S PARENT OR GUARDIAN
Date: December 22, 2020AFFIDAVIT FILED
Date: December 22, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | COURT ORDER REPORT OF DISPOSITION | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Adjudicated Guilty (Civil) | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT | |
March 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NO PLEA ENTERED | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $30.00 ON RECEIPT 2623772, FULLY PAID $30.00 2623772 Fully Paid |
|
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | EXTENSION TO PAY GIVEN 2/18/2021 | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
JUDGE REASSIGNMENT PER ADMIN ORDER L-2020-38-A DATED DECEMBER 14, 2020 NEAL, TERRY T PEPPERMAN, CARLA R Per Admin Order L-2020-38-A dated December 14, 2020 |
|
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | TOBACCO LETTER MAILED TO DEFENDANT'S PARENT OR GUARDIAN | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | TOBACCO CASE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.