Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Lake County, FL, . Lake County, FL Superior Courts with WELKE, BRIAN J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWELKE, BRIAN J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2020 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationLake County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
PAID $11.39 ON RECEIPT 2656475, FULLY PAID $11.39 2656475 Fully Paid |
|
February 10, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF VITAL STATISTICS FORM | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Disposed by Judge | |
February 09, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE FILED AND RECORDED | |
January 28, 2021 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING SET FOR 2/9/21 @9 AM VIA ZOOM |
|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
COPY OF LICENSE OF LIBBY, CLIFFORD MICHAEL LIBBY, CLIFFORD MICHAEL |
|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS | |
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT SIGNED BY BOTH PARTIES |
|
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | VITAL STATISTIC FORM NOT SIGNED (FOR FUTURE USE) | |
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | DISCLOSURE FROM NON LAWYER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.