Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Pleas, Charlie, Pleas, Terousha, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against City Of Monticello, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts with DAWN CALOCA-JOHNSON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAWN CALOCA-JOHNSON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 06, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 10, 2017 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
February 09, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION | |
January 20, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING DEFENDANTS ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST INTERROGATORIES | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE FOR SUBPOENA FOR DEPOSITION | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT CITY OF MONTICELLOS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSION | |
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTIO OF DOCUMENTS | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT CITY OF MONTICELLO | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.