Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Us Bank National Association A, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fishman, Barry Stuart, against Clark, Susan W, Foundation Finance Company Llc, Susan W Clark Surviving Spouse, United States Of America Depar, Unknown Parties In Possession, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts with DAWN CALOCA-JOHNSON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAWN CALOCA-JOHNSON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2016 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS
Date: June 17, 2016SUMMONS ISSUED SUSAN W CLARK
Date: June 21, 2016SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SUSAL W CLARK
Date: June 21, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER CANCELING SALE DISMISSING ACTION DISCHARGING LIS PENDENS VACATING JUDGMENT AND DIRECTING CLERK TO RETURN THE ORIGINAL NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CANCEL SALE , DISMISS ACTION, DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS, VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT, AND RETURN THE ORIGINAL NOTE AND ORIGINAL MORTGAGE | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
December 06, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR DEFENDANT SUSAN CLARK | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Event FS scheduled on 12/22/2016 at 1100 AM, MX - Judge JUDGE NO presiding. | |
November 16, 2016 | Docket Event | EMAILED NOTICE OF SALE TO MONTICELLO NEWS FOR PUBLICATION | |
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE | |
November 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.