Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Plummer, Barbara, Plummer, Rosa, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Pearson, Fred Eugene, against Oreilly Automotive Stores Inc, Ozark Automotive Distributors, Jackson, Zachary, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2016 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ZACHARY JACKSON | |
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS REPLY TO DEFENDANTS JACKSON OZARK AND OREILLY AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
August 16, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL | |
August 16, 2016 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY OF DEFENDANTS | |
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED OREILLY AUTOMOTIVE STORES C/O CT CORPORATION AND OZARK AUTOMOTIVE | |
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT | |
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED CT CORPORATION SYSTEM RA OZARK AUTOMOTIVE | |
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED CT CORPORATION SYSTEM RA OF OREILLY AUTOMOTIVE STORES INC | |
April 25, 2016 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED ZACHARY JACKSON | |
April 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Payment received: $430.00 Receipt Number MX 20161592 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.