Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Craig, Johnny Blue, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Switalski, David Barkley, against Jon Kohler And Associates Llc, represented by Boyd, Joseph Robert, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts with DAWN CALOCA-JOHNSON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDAWN CALOCA-JOHNSON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 11, 2016 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
November 11, 2016 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - JOHNNY B CRAIG | |
November 10, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS FIRST INTERROGATORIES | |
November 09, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO DEFENDANTS FIRST INTERROGATORIES | |
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - JON KOHLER | |
October 27, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION JOHNNY BLUE CRAIG | |
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION - JON KOHLER | |
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.