Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Airstrip Owners, Deszell, Doug, Pierce, James, Westbrook, Buddy, Sutor, Scott, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Hargrove, Brant Lamar, against Ashville Area Property Owners, represented by Roberts, Sally Jean, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts with KAREN GIEVERS presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKAREN GIEVERS Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2015 |
CategoryRp/Mf-Oth Real Prop Actn $0-50,000 |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 28, 2017 | Docket Event | AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT | |
March 09, 2017 | Docket Event | PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT | |
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENTS AND WITNESS LIST FOR TRIAL | |
February 07, 2017 | Docket Event | SECOND NOTICE OF FILING DOCUMENTS AND WITNESSES FOR TRIAL | |
December 16, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY | |
October 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Event NJ scheduled on 2/17/2017 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge DAWN CALOCA-JOHNSON presiding. | |
October 11, 2016 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER SETTING NON JURY TRIAL | |
August 01, 2016 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION OF ISSUES TO BE LITIGATED | |
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | AMENDED ORDER AS TO PHONE NUMBER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.