Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Holt Webb, Anne H, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Bruner, James Hamilton Kerr, against Capital City Bank, Moss, Wendy G, represented by Abele, Kenneth Paul, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts with Karen A. Gievers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKaren A. Gievers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2014 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
December 12, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER OF ABATEMENT | |
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event | JOINT MOTION TO ABATE | |
August 23, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE RETURNED | |
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE | |
August 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Payment received: $395.00 Receipt Number MX 20163226 | |
August 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $395.00 | |
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | COSTS AFFIDAVIT | |
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT ON ATTORNEYS TIME AND FEES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.