Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Peck, Dorothy Adams, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Leinback, Bruce Alan, against Miller, Benjamin D, Suwannee River Construction Co, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts with Karen A. Gievers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKaren A. Gievers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2014 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR PAYMENT | |
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event | AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER AUTHORIZING COUNSEL TO WITHDRAW | |
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event | PROOF OF SERVICE OF ORDER AUTHORIZING COUNSEL TO WITHDRAW | |
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER AUTHORIZING COUNSEL TO WITHDRAW | |
February 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Event NJ scheduled on 4/1/2015 at 0100 PM, MX - Judge KAREN GIEVERS presiding. | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT HEARING | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | CORRECTED ORDER SETTING NON JURY TRIAL | |
February 17, 2015 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO MOTION TO WITHDRAW |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.