Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Guidroz, Scott M, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Hanover Insurance Company, represented by Prusak, Gregory Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2014 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
March 31, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Status set to RECLOSED | |
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $50.00 | |
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Reopened for CIVIL OTHER on 7/28/2014 | |
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Status set to REOPENED | |
April 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
April 21, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.