Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Fountain, Kevin, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Armellini Express Lines Inc, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2014 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 15, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER CLOSING CASE | |
April 21, 2015 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
March 03, 2015 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
February 23, 2015 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS CERTIFICATION OF MEDIATION AUTHORITY | |
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT ARMELLINI EXPRESS LINES INCS NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY | |
November 19, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.