Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Baughman, Nan L, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case against City Of Monticello, Florida Department Of Financia, Florida Department Of Transpor, Transfield Services Infrastruc, Vms Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Adkins, Gwendolyn Palmer, Van Den Berg, Elizabeth Minor, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts with Karen A. Gievers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKaren A. Gievers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2014 |
CategoryNegligence- Premises Liability Commercia |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING CASE | |
March 22, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL MEDIATION REPORT | |
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE | |
February 02, 2016 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
January 28, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER TO ENFORCE MEDIATION | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Event JRT scheduled on 8/29/2016 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge KAREN GIEVERS presiding. | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Event PT scheduled on 8/9/2016 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge KAREN GIEVERS presiding. | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ENFORCE MEDIATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.