Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Att Mobility Llc, filed a(n) Other case against Marshall Stranburg Florida Dep, Lois Howell Hunter Jefferson C, Angela Gray Jefferson County P, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts with Karen Gievers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKaren Gievers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2013 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH SECTION 20 OF PROTECTIVE ORDER AND PROCEDURE FOR SEALING CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS AND INFORMATION | |
April 14, 2015 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH SECTION 20 OF PROTECTIVE ORDER AND PROCEDURE FOR SEALING CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENT AND INFORMATION | |
January 26, 2015 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL | |
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
January 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF/FOR TRIAL | |
December 12, 2014 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED | |
December 10, 2014 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED | |
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT MARSHALL STRANBURGS MOTOIN TO APPEAR BY PHONE | |
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.