Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Battle, Thomas, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case against Con Way Freight Inc, represented by Craig, James Morgan, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts with Karen A. Gievers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKaren A. Gievers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2013 |
CategoryOther-Discrimination Employment/Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
September 22, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 19, 2014 | Docket Event | JOINT MOTION AND STIPULATION FO DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
August 26, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS FOURTH AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING TRAVIS FOLLMARS ALLEGED FUEL THEFT ARREST AND PROSECUTION | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING ALLEGED DISCRIMINATION COMPLAINT BY PLAINTIFF | |
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT LIST FOR TRIAL | |
August 22, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFFS AMENDED WITNESS LIST FOR TRIAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.