Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gilley, Linda B, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Geico General Insurance Compan, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts with Karen Gievers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKaren Gievers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 15, 2013 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
September 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 09, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFAULT | |
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Event PT scheduled on 2/10/2015 at 0200 PM, MX - Judge KAREN GIEVERS presiding. | |
August 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Event JRT scheduled on 3/30/2015 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge KAREN GIEVERS presiding. | |
August 11, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL | |
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR HEARING ON DAMAGES | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
January 29, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ISSUED | |
September 17, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING RETURN OF SERVICE ON GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.