Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hays, William, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case against Carr, Mildred E, Roberts, Frank P, Tnb Financial Services Inc, represented by Hatcher, Louis Edward, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts with Karen A. Gievers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKaren A. Gievers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2013 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 19, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
March 18, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 14, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
March 05, 2014 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS | |
February 13, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION | |
February 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Event PT scheduled on 3/13/2014 at 1100 AM, MX - Judge KAREN GIEVERS presiding. | |
February 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Event JRT scheduled on 3/31/2014 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge KAREN GIEVERS presiding. | |
February 10, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL | |
October 18, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.