Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Newton, Jessica, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Perry, Henry Lawrence, against Toyota Cho, Toyota Engineering And Manufac, Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Sales Usa, represented by Crongeyer, James Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2013 |
CategoryNegligence- Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 28, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 28, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING ALL CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE | |
July 18, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT | |
July 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
July 07, 2014 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
June 23, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING | |
June 23, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT | |
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY | |
June 13, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS TOYOTA MOTOR CORPORATION TOYOTA MOTOR SALES USA INC AND TOYOTA ENGINEERING AND MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA INCS NOTICE OF IDENTIFICATION OF INDIVIDUALS ATTENDING MEDIATION AND CERTIFICATION AND CERTIFICATION OF AUTHORITY | |
June 09, 2014 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.