Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Pnc Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Burley, Jessica Craven, against Ahrens, Ryan Michelle, Dennis, Douglas Keith, Dennis, Glenn Ian, Hamilton, Deidra Kay, Radney, Horace G, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts with Karen A. Gievers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKaren A. Gievers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2012 |
CategoryRp/Mf-Homestead Resid $50,001-249,999 |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING CASE | |
September 23, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS WITNESS AND EXHIBIT LISTS | |
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING OF DEATH CERTIFICATE | |
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING DEATH CERTIFICATE | |
July 30, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR SEPTEMBER 22 2014 | |
July 25, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF/FOR TRIAL | |
July 10, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ISSUED | |
July 08, 2014 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
July 08, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.