Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Pleas, Rickie Allen, filed a(n) Other case represented by Mattox, Marie A, against Hobbs, David C, Wilcox, Logan D, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts with Karen A. Gievers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKaren A. Gievers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 27, 2012 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2014 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
May 28, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANTS NOTICE AND MOTION TO DISMISS | |
May 27, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER RESETTING HEARING | |
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR PLAINTIFF TO SHOW COMPLIANCE WITH PRIOR ORDER OR FACE DISMISSAL OF CASE | |
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO THE COURT AND MOTION TO DISMISS OF DEFENDANTS | |
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO COMPEL AND FOR SANCTIONS AND ON THE MOTION TO WITHDRAW OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL | |
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
December 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 1/13/2014 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge KAREN GIEVERS presiding. | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.