Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sparks, Marilouise, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Hargrove, Brant Lamar, against Lamb, Dawn Louise, Sparks, Robert Frederick, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts with Karen A. Gievers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKaren A. Gievers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2012 |
CategoryRp/Mf-Oth Real Prop Actn $0-50,000 |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF COUNTERCLAIM WITH PREJUDICE | |
November 26, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJDUCIE | |
November 25, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS | |
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING FINAL EVIDENTIARY HEARING NON JURY TRIAL | |
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Event NJ scheduled on 1/15/2014 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge KAREN GIEVERS presiding. | |
October 07, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NO RECORD ACTIVITY | |
April 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Judge: GIEVERS , KAREN A Assigned | |
September 13, 2012 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
September 10, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL SERVICE ADDRESSES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.