Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Us Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Savlov, Jeffrey H, against Nealy, Doris M, Jefferson County Ship Program, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts with Karen A. Gievers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKaren A. Gievers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2012 |
CategoryRp/Mf-Homestead Resid $50,001-249,999 |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | COT ISSUED set on 11/15/2013 | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | COT ISSUED action date changed to 11/15/2013 | |
November 19, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE with a due date 10/29/2013 updated with compliance action of COT ISSUED | |
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE | |
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number MX 5420 | |
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Compliance COT has been created with due date of 10/29/2013 | |
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event | BID SHEETS | |
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $70.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.