Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Miller, Cliff, filed a(n) Discrimination - Labor and Employment case represented by Goodman, Erika Esan, against Florida Management Associates, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2011 |
CategoryOther-Discrimination Employment/Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
Matter TypeDiscrimination |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
September 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 27, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
September 04, 2012 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
May 09, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
May 01, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SUBSTUTUTE COUNSEL | |
April 27, 2012 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM PMI TO JUDGE SHEFFIELD | |
January 31, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
October 21, 2011 | Docket Event | FILING AGREEMENT | |
October 21, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT FLORIDA MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES INCS NOTICE OF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.