Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Harrell, Cynthia, Harrell, Robert, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Ellis, Johnny L, State Farm Mutual Automobile, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 21, 2010 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2011 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
June 08, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTIES | |
May 04, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT | |
April 20, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
March 21, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event | SUBPOENAS AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF COPIES | |
February 28, 2011 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NON OBJECTION TO ISSUANCE OF NON PARTY | |
February 25, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON OBJECTION TO PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTIES | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | SUBPOENAS AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF COPIES | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF NON OBJECTION TO ISSUANCE OF NON PARTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.