Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sif Land Inc, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Duchemin, Claire Anita, against Sanchelima, Juan Andres, Mambi Cheese Company Inc, represented by Gonzalez, Irain Alberto, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts with Karen A. Gievers presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKaren A. Gievers Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 15, 2009 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness(Inactive) |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
February 10, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | |
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
January 24, 2014 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER | |
January 21, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES | |
January 15, 2014 | Docket Event | Event HEARING scheduled on 2/25/2014 at 0130 PM, MX - Judge KAREN GIEVERS presiding. | |
January 09, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
December 16, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM DCA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.