Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Miller, C P, filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Jacobs, Ennis Leon, against Joyner, Felix R, Bishop, Marty, Plaines, Robert R, Jefferson Co Canvassing Board, Boyd, Hines P, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, FL, . Jefferson County, FL Superior Courts with Robert R. Plaines presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert R. Plaines Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 02, 2008 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationJefferson County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
October 16, 2008 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT BOYDS MOTION TO STRIKE AND OR DISMISS | |
October 13, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE AND OR DISMISS FILED BY JC CANVASSING BOARD | |
October 09, 2008 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE FOR FELIX JOYNER 10/7/08 | |
October 08, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF CP MILLER | |
October 07, 2008 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE FOR MARTY BISHOP 10/3/08 | |
October 07, 2008 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE FOR JUDGE ROBERT R PLAINES 10/3/08 | |
October 07, 2008 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE FOR HINES F BOYD 10/6/08 | |
October 02, 2008 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR WRIT OF QUO WARRANTO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.