Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Taylor, John, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Taylor, Cheyenne Leigh, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts with GOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGOODMAN, JAMES JEFFERSON JR. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2020 |
CategoryDomestic Relations/Family 16-E |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | RECORDED FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF SIMPLIFIED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE | |
January 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTES FINAL JUDGMENT IS BEING PREPARED | |
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Judge: GOODMAN JR, JAMES J assigned | |
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Case 322020DR000387DRAXMX Filed with Clerk on 12/23/2020 | |
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00 | |
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $409.00 Balance Remaining $409.00 | |
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $409.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Payment received: $409.00 Receipt Number MX 2020013662 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.