Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Williams, Constance L, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Kespohl, Jeremy Alan, against Fca Us Llc, represented by Lueckert, Kelli Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Jackson County, FL, . Jackson County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2016 |
CategoryContracts And Indebtedness |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationJackson County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event | RECORDED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
January 12, 2017 | Docket Event | LETTER | |
January 04, 2017 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event | FCA US LLC'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUESTS FOR ADMISSIONS | |
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FCA US LLC'S ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES | |
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event | FCA US LLC'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
September 26, 2016 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND MOTION TO STRIKE AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE #25 | |
September 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Defense Attorney: Kelli E. Lueckert Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.